Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santiago de Cuba

Archidioecesis Sancti Iacobi in Cuba



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1803
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cuba
  • Square Kilometers: 6,043 (2,334 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Sánchez Hechavarría 607, Santiago de Cuba 90100, Cuba
  • Telephone: (022)625.480
  • Fax: 686.186

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Baracoa (All Cuba)
1518ErectedDiocese of Baracoa (All Cuba) (erected) (Suffragan of Seville, Spain)
Diocese of Santiago de Cuba
28 April 1522Name ChangedDiocese of Baracoa (All Cuba) Diocese of Santiago de Cuba
1527Territory AddedDiocese of Concepción de la Vega (suppressed) Diocese of Santiago de Cuba
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Santiago de Cuba (From Seville (Spain) to Santo Domingo (Dominican Republic))
10 September 1787Territory LostDiocese of Santiago de Cuba Diocese of San Cristobal de la Habana (erected) (Provinces of Santa Clara, Matanzas, Havana, and Pinar del Rio in Cuba and Florida and Louisiana)
Archdiocese of Santiago de Cuba
24 November 1803ElevatedDiocese of Santiago de Cuba Archdiocese of Santiago de Cuba
10 December 1912Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Cuba Diocese of Camagüey (erected)
8 January 1979Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Cuba Diocese of Holguín (erected)
9 December 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Cuba Diocese of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo (erected)
24 January 1998Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Cuba Diocese of Guantánamo-Baracoa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Santiago de Cuba
195034508408419830ap1951
19662,200,000.0%1422360735ap1967
19702,960,000.0%1321340231735ap1971
1976980,0003,100,00031.6%21153627,222171535ap1977
1980540,0002,200,00024.5%13112422,500171721ap1981
1990570,0002,308,00024.7%16112721,111143321ap1991
1999241,0001,909,00012.6%9132210,954353213ap2000
2000241,0001,090,00022.1%9132210,954243013ap2001
2001246,0001,090,00022.6%8122012,300242913ap2002
2002247,0001,094,00022.6%9142310,739263313ap2003
2003248,0001,041,37423.8%8122012,400153113ap2004
2004248,0001,041,37423.8%8122012,4002173313ap2005
2010255,5001,050,00024.3%1511269,8264173616ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013