Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Noel Antonio Londoño Buitrago, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Jericó, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1949 Born
22 Dec 196617.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Jan 197323.4Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Nov 197324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Jun 201363.8AppointedBishop of Jericó, Colombia
10 Aug 201364.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jericó, Colombia
24 Aug 201364.0InstalledBishop of Jericó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Noel Antonio Londoño Buitrago
Bishop Noel Antonio Londoño Buitrago C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Jericó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuimbaye

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jericó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2013
  • ob/i: CB, 22 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 8 Aug 2013
  • c3: CB, 24 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,847
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast