Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elie (Yéghia) Yéghiayan, I.C.P.B.

Bishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1950 Born
24 Mar 197423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
23 Jun 201868.0AppointedBishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France
12 Aug 201868.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France

MicroData Summary for Elie (Yéghia) Yéghiayan
Bishop Elie (Yéghia) Yéghiayan I.C.P.B. (born ) Bishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo, Syria
Ordained BishopOutdoors, near, Convent, Bzommar

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Jun 2018
  • c3: CB, 12 Aug 2018
  • c4: CB, 15 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Aug 2018

Quantcast