Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Luc Brunin

Bishop of Le Havre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1951 BornRoubaix
11 Apr 198130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
20 Apr 200049.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France
20 Apr 200049.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Usinaza
28 May 200049.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usinaza
6 May 200453.3AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
24 Jun 201160.4AppointedBishop of Le Havre, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Luc Brunin:
Bishop Jean-Luc Brunin (born ) Bishop of Le Havre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Le Havre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013