Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Effiong Ekuwem

Archbishop of Calabar, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1949 Born
30 Jun 197929.5Ordained PriestPriest of Calabar, Nigeria
4 Jul 198939.5AppointedBishop of Uyo, Nigeria
9 Dec 198939.9Ordained BishopBishop of Uyo, Nigeria
2 Feb 201363.1AppointedArchbishop of Calabar, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Effiong Ekuwem
Archbishop Joseph Effiong Ekuwem (born ) Archbishop of Calabar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOffi Udah

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Calabar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,955
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,279
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017