Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Winnipeg (Ukrainian)

Vinnipegensis Ucrainorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Lawrence Daniel Huculak, O.S.B.M., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archeparchy
  • Elevated: 3 November 1956
  • Metropolitan See
  • Ukrainian Catholic Church of the Byzantine Tradition
  • Province: Manitoba
  • Country: Canada
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archeparchy.ca/
  • Mailing Address: Archeparchy Office, 233 Scotia Street, Winnipeg, Man. R2V 1V7, Canada
  • Telephone: (204)338-7801
  • Fax: 330-4006

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of Canada (Ukrainian)
15 June 1912ErectedApostolic Exarchate of Canada (Ukrainian) (erected)
19 January 1948Territory LostApostolic Exarchate of Canada (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian) (erected)
19 January 1948Territory LostApostolic Exarchate of Canada (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Western Canada (Ukrainian) (erected)
Apostolic Exarchate of Central Canada (Ukrainian)
19 January 1948Name ChangedApostolic Exarchate of Canada (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Central Canada (Ukrainian)
Apostolic Exarchate of Manitoba (Ukrainian)
10 March 1951Name ChangedApostolic Exarchate of Central Canada (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Manitoba (Ukrainian)
Archeparchy of Winnipeg (Ukrainian)
3 November 1956ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Manitoba (Ukrainian) Archeparchy of Winnipeg (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of Central Canada (Ukrainian)
1949107,3551,630,0006.6%7020901,192306222ap1951
Apostolic Exarchate of Manitoba (Ukrainian)
Archeparchy of Winnipeg (Ukrainian)
196658,200970,0006.0%4518639231845166ap1967
197060,0001,000,0006.0%4613591,0162134540ap1971
197660,000415461,3045541ap1977
198055,0003818569825183042ap1981
199049,3753216481,02818174635ap1991
199945,000388469782183396ap2000
200012,55035104527820102699ap2001
200113,500331043313191035105ap2002
200233,4903794672815928105ap2003
200329,740381149606151132146ap2004
200429,740341650594151627144ap2005
200929,740291039762141022131ap2010
201029,740321143691121123136ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013