Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Gerard Wenski

Archbishop of Miami, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1950 BornWest Palm Beach
15 May 197625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
24 Jun 199746.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
24 Jun 199746.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Kearney
3 Sep 199746.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Kearney
1 Jul 200352.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
22 Aug 200352.8InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
13 Nov 200454.1SucceededBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
20 Apr 201059.5AppointedArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA
1 Jun 201059.6InstalledArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Gerard Wenski:
Archbishop Thomas Gerard Wenski (born ) Archbishop of Miami

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Miami.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,041

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Mar 2014