Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Gerard Duca

Bishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1952 Born
29 Apr 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
1 Apr 200855.8AppointedBishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
19 May 200855.9Ordained BishopBishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
26 Jun 201866.0AppointedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
24 Aug 201866.2InstalledBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Gerard Duca
Bishop Michael Gerard Duca (born ) Bishop of Baton Rouge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDallas, TX, Diocese of Dallas, Texas
Ordained BishopShreveport Convention Center, Shreveport, Diocese of Shreveport, Louisiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baton Rouge.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,747
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 26 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast