Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Belley-Ars

Dioecesis Bellicensis-Arsensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pascal Marie Roland, Bishop
  • Guy Claude Bagnard, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 23 January 1988
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lyon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,554 (2,145 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-belley-ars.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 31 rue Docteur-Victor-Nodet, B.P. 154, 01004 Bourg-en-Bresse CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 4.74.32.86.32
  • Fax: 4.74.32.86.31

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Belley
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Belley (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Belley (suppressed) Archdiocese of Lyon
Diocese of Belley
6 October 1822RestoredArchdiocese of Lyon Diocese of Belley
Diocese of Belley-Ars
23 January 1988Name ChangedDiocese of Belley Diocese of Belley-Ars

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Belley
1950290,000306,86494.5%40258460630125325443ap1951
1959290,000312,00392.9%387854726141851,007443ap1960
1969290,000365,83179.3%34765412703140900183ap1971
1980290,700377,40077.0%2695532489793667353ap1981
Diocese of Belley-Ars
1990369,000430,00085.8%229552841,2993116503342ap1991
1999350,000510,00068.6%196352311,515860365340ap2000
2000350,000515,18667.9%194402341,495863355340ap2001
2001350,000515,27067.9%193482411,452976349340ap2002
2002350,000515,27067.9%188232111,658843332340ap2003
2003350,000515,27067.9%184202041,7151040325340ap2004
2004350,000515,27067.9%180171971,7761227300340ap2005
2006350,000515,27867.9%180191991,7581135247340ap2007
2012354,600584,00060.7%180121921,8461359218340ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.2, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 14 Nov 2014