Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Darwin

Dioecesis Darvinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Daniel Eugene Hurley, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 29 March 1938
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Adelaide
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 1,352,212 (522,291 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.darwin.catholic.org.au/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, G.P.O. Box 476, N.T. 0801; 2 St. John Court, The Gardens, Darwin, N.T. 0820, Australia
  • Telephone: (08)8941-1244
  • Fax: 8941-2101

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Essington
1845ErectedArchdiocese of Sydney Vicariate Apostolic of Essington (erected)
Diocese of Victoria
27 May 1847ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Essington Diocese of Victoria
Diocese of Victoria-Palmerston
10 August 1888Name ChangedDiocese of Victoria Diocese of Victoria-Palmerston
Diocese of Darwin
29 March 1938Name ChangedDiocese of Victoria-Palmerston Diocese of Darwin

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Darwin
19503,00021,00014.3%141421422414ap1951
196610,50050,00021.0%2424437375411ap1967
197015,26868,04222.4%232366336475ap1971
198019,68998,80019.9%31922894139777ap1981
199032,156156,10020.6%425291,10815910110ap1991
199942,551189,99122.4%424281,5194528111ap2000
200042,551189,99122.4%321241,7724537412ap2001
200142,551195,46321.8%320231,8503506511ap2002
200242,551195,46321.8%320231,8503506511ap2003
200345,059197,70022.8%322251,8023466711ap2004
200444,231198,60022.3%723301,4743496911ap2005
200645,072202,79322.2%721281,6093405711ap2007*
200945,600205,90022.1%718251,8246375211ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014