Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Archidioecesis Sancti Joannis Portoricensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 April 1960
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Puerto Rico
  • Square Kilometers: 1,059 (353 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the northeast portion of the Island of Puerto Rico.
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SJN
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arqsj.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle San Jorge 201, Santurce, Apartado 9021967, San Juan, PR 00902-1967, Puerto Rico
  • Telephone: (787)727-7373
  • Fax: 726-8280

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
8 August 1511ErectedDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) (erected) (Suffragan of Seville, Spain)
1519Territory AddedDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) (Windward Islands of the Lesser Antilles from Santa Cruz to Dominica)
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) (From Seville (Spain) to Santo Domngo (Dominican Republic))
20 May 1790Territory LostDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) Diocese of Guayana (erected)
21 November 1924Territory LostDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) Diocese of Ponce (erected)
Diocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
21 November 1924Name ChangedDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) Diocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
30 April 1960Territory LostDiocese of Ponce
Diocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Diocese of Arecibo (erected)
Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
30 April 1960ElevatedDiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
4 November 1964Territory LostDiocese of Ponce
Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Diocese of Caguas (erected)
11 March 2008Territory LostDiocese of Caguas
Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Diocese of Fajardo-Humacao (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
19491,130,0001,200,00094.2%411321736,53114734263ap1951
Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
1966700,000800,00087.5%661892552,74522063953ap1967
1970970,4001,500,00064.7%891892783,49023439183ap1971
1976874,2401,090,80080.1%882323202,732294833110ap1977
19801,002,0801,252,60080.0%1082193273,06457313750119ap1981
1990989,0001,237,00080.0%1242223462,858241306629146ap1991
19991,127,1971,408,99780.0%1491773263,457263219314153ap2000
20001,007,1971,393,61172.3%1422073492,885262291506154ap2001
20011,000,0001,435,78269.6%1352103452,898265284489154ap2002
20021,001,6281,460,59368.6%1341963303,035256279554154ap2003
20031,011,1781,697,43559.6%1391893283,082242252380154ap2004
20041,064,6221,419,49675.0%1441913353,177241251510154ap2005
2010898,2181,281,89370.1%1151642793,219165203459142ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013