Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lazarus You Heung-sik

Prefect of the Congregation for the Clergy

Bishop Emeritus of Daejeon {Taejon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1951 Born
9 Dec 197928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
9 Jul 200351.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
19 Aug 200351.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
1 Apr 200553.3SucceededBishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
11 Jun 202169.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
11 Jun 202169.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
1 Aug 202169.7InstalledPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy

MicroData Summary for Lazarus You Heung-sik
Archbishop Lazarus You Heung-sik (born ) Prefect of Clergy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNonsan-gun Chungnam
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopChang Mu Gymnasium, Taejon, Diocese of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Clergy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,442
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Aug 2021

Quantcast