Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto Octavio González Nieves, O.F.M.

Archbishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico


from the Official Web Site of the Diocese

from the Official Web Site of the Diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1950 BornElizabeth, NJ, USA
25 Aug 197323.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 May 197726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jul 198838.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
19 Jul 198838.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ursona
3 Oct 198838.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ursona
16 May 199545.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
26 Jun 199545.1InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
1 Apr 199746.8SucceededBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
26 Mar 199948.8AppointedArchbishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
8 May 199948.9InstalledArchbishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Roberto Octavio González Nieves:
Archbishop Roberto Octavio González Nieves O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,818

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013