Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angel Sebastián Martínez, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Lai

Apostolic Administrator of Doba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1950 BornZaragoza, Spain
7 Jun 197524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
28 Nov 199848.2AppointedBishop of Lai, Chad
14 Feb 199948.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lai, Chad
30 Jan 201463.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Doba, Chad

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angel Sebastián Martínez:
Bishop Miguel Angel Sebastián Martínez M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Lai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,480
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 30 Jan 2014