Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Fiandri, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic of El Petén

Titular Bishop of Madarsuma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1947 BornArborea, Italy
13 Aug 196921.6ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Aug 197426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Feb 200961.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Petén, Guatemala
10 Feb 200961.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Madarsuma
21 Mar 200961.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madarsuma

MicroData Summary for Mario Fiandri:
Bishop Mario Fiandri S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of El Petén

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of El Petén.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,072

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015