Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Davao

Archidioecesis Davaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Romulo Geolina Valles, Archbishop
  • George Beluso Rimando, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Fernando R. Capalla, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 June 1970
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 2,443 (943 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's Residence, 247 Fr. Torres Str., P.O. Box 80418, Davao City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (082)22.75.992; 22.11.234
  • Fax: 22.79.771

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Davao
17 December 1949ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Davao (erected)
Diocese of Davao
11 July 1966ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Davao Diocese of Davao
Archdiocese of Davao
29 June 1970ElevatedDiocese of Davao Archdiocese of Davao
5 November 1979Territory LostArchdiocese of Davao Diocese of Digos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Davao
1950350,000450,00077.8%413447,95463513ap1951
Diocese of Davao
Archdiocese of Davao
1970736,535876,66384.0%111051166,34912419029ap1971
1980480,000540,52788.8%1779965,00010315817ap1981
1990643,534748,21186.0%4058986,5666921522ap1991
1999995,2501,684,00059.1%64491138,8078330025ap2000
2000995,2501,123,28088.6%59461059,4787725725ap2001
2001995,2501,684,00059.1%66631297,71511233527ap2002
20021,063,0711,402,61175.8%69571268,43715237827ap2003
20031,017,9811,330,67676.5%68631317,77010735228ap2004
20041,109,4981,369,91381.0%65631288,66711035230ap2005
20061,063,0001,323,00080.3%75711467,28011336832ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 11 Feb 2012