Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of São Paulo

Archidioecesis Sancti Pauli in Brasilia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Odilo Pedro Scherer, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Cicero Alves de França, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Rogério Augusto das Neves, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Carlos Lema Garcia, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Ângelo Ademir Mezzari, R.C.J., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jorge Pierozan, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Carlos Silva, O.F.M. Cap., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Edilson de Souza Silva, Auxiliary Bishop-Elect

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 7 June 1908
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 654 (252 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 1
  • Official Web Site: https://arquisp.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Av. Higienopolis 890, 01238-000 Sao Paulo, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (011)3660-3700

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of São Paulo
6 December 1745ErectedDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Territorial Prelature of Cuiabá (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Goiás (erected)
Diocese of Mariana (erected)
Diocese of São Paulo (erected)
27 April 1892Territory LostDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Curitiba (erected)
8 September 1907Territory LostDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Campanha (erected)
7 June 1908Territory LostDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Botucatu (erected)
7 June 1908Territory LostDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Campinas (erected)
7 June 1908Territory LostDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Ribeirão Preto (erected)
7 June 1908Territory LostDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of São Carlos do Pinhal (erected)
7 June 1908Territory LostDiocese of São Paulo (Vale do Paraíba Paulista, the São Paulo side of Serra da Mantiqueira and Serra do Mar, and the North Coast) Diocese of Taubaté (erected)
Archdiocese of São Paulo
7 June 1908ElevatedDiocese of São Paulo Archdiocese of São Paulo
4 July 1924Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Santos (erected)
4 July 1924Territory LostDiocese of Botucatu
Archdiocese of São Paulo
Diocese of Taubaté
Diocese of Sorocaba (erected)
24 July 1925Territory LostDiocese of Campinas
Archdiocese of São Paulo
Diocese of Bragança Paulista (erected)
3 May 1952Territory AddedArchdiocese of São Paulo
Diocese of Taubaté
18 July 1954Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Santo André, São Bernardo, and São Caetano) Diocese of Santo André (erected)
14 February 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Rest of Sorocaba) Diocese of Sorocaba
14 February 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Vinhedo) Diocese of Campinas
19 April 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Parts of Aparecida)
Diocese of Taubaté (Guaratingueta and Lagoinha, and Parts of Aparecida)
Archdiocese of Aparecida (erected)
9 June 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Mogi das Cruzes, Arujá, Ferraz de Vasconcellos, Guararema, Guarulhos, Itaquaquecetuba, Poá, and Suzano)
Diocese of Taubaté (Igaratá, Salesopólis, and Santa Isabel)
Diocese of Mogi das Cruzes (erected)
7 November 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Campinas (Louveira)
Archdiocese of São Paulo (Cabreúva, Cajamar, Campo Limpo, Itu, Itupeva, Jundiai, Pirapora do Bom Jesus, Santana do Parnaíba, Salto, and Varzea Paulista)
Diocese of Jundiaí (erected)
15 March 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Itapecerica da Serra, Embú, Embú-Guacú, Juquitiba, and Taboäo da Serra along with São Lucas (in Lapa) and São Pedro and São Paulo (in Centro)) Diocese of Campo Limpo (erected)
15 March 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Osasco, Barueri, Carapicuíba, Cotia, Itapeví, Ibiúna, Jandira, Mairinque, São Roque, and Vargem Grande Paulista along with San Antonio (in Lapa)) Diocese of Osasco (erected)
15 March 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Santo Amaro (erected)
15 March 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo Diocese of São Miguel Paulista (erected)
21 August 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of São Paulo (Santa Cruz, São José Operario, São Judas Tadeu, and São Sebastiào (in Campo Limpo); Nossa Senhora de Fatima (belezas), Nossa Senhora de Bom Conselho, Nossa Senhora do Carmo, São Francisco de Assis, São José Operario and São Luis Gonzaga (in Capão Red...) Diocese of Campo Limpo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of São Paulo
19664,950,0005,320,00093.0%16716729,6409573,215262ap1967
19705,600,0006,435,98987.0%3518621,2134,6161,0723,775311ap1971
19766,200,0007,198,60886.1%5301,7012,2312,77912,2963,405353ap1977
19808,430,0009,684,00087.1%3526651,0178,28911,0463,070364ap1981
19907,110,0007,900,00090.0%3354377729,20918032,316241ap1991
19996,669,7208,892,96075.0%3505539037,38611,3262,347268ap2000
20006,674,8428,899,79075.0%3535188717,66311,2432,203268ap2001
20016,679,0008,906,62575.0%3875108977,44511,1832,140268ap2002
20026,767,0009,023,00075.0%3455028477,98911,1262,132275ap2003
20036,713,1008,950,80075.0%3637451,1086,05831,1382,102277ap2004
20045,935,8077,075,54783.9%3515619126,50831,2071,880280ap2005
20105,484,0007,511,00073.0%3345248586,391501,0421,693296ap2011
20144,815,0006,899,26869.8%3764668425,718757741,668300ap2015
20174,984,4847,669,97665.0%4105039135,459966411,977306ap2018
20205,101,3007,850,00065.0%3896411,0304,9521087791,977304ap2021
20225,101,0007,850,00065.0%3906741,0644,7941128121,977307ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of São Paulo
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 331
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 136
  • Archdiocese of São Paulo
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 630, and Page 631

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 22 Feb 2024