Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Giuliano

Bishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1951 Born
16 May 198230.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nola, Italy
20 Oct 201665.3AppointedBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
27 Dec 201665.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
4 Feb 201765.6InstalledBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giuliano
Bishop Giuseppe Giuliano (born ) Bishop of Lucera-Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nola, Diocese of Nola

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lucera-Troia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2016
  • ob/c12: CB, 20 Oct 2016
  • i: CB, 23 Oct 2016
  • c34: CB, 27 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast