Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Medellín

Archidioecesis Medellensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 February 1902
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 708 (273 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arq-medellin.org.co/
  • Mailing Address: Calle 57 N. 49-44, Medellin, Colombia
  • Telephone: (94)251.77.00
  • Fax: 251.93.95

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Medellín
14 February 1868ErectedDiocese of Antioquía Diocese of Medellín (erected)
11 April 1900Territory LostDiocese of Medellín Diocese of Manizales (erected)
Archdiocese of Medellín
24 February 1902ElevatedDiocese of Medellín Archdiocese of Medellín
1915Territory LostArchdiocese of Medellín
18 March 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Medellín Diocese of Sonsón (erected)
18 June 1988Territory LostArchdiocese of Medellín Diocese of Caldas (erected)
18 June 1988Territory LostArchdiocese of Medellín Diocese of Girardota (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Medellín
1950800,000800,000100.0%275913662,1852531,67664ap1951
19661,200,0001,250,00096.0%2982515492,1854523,144145ap1967
19681,500,0001,586,65094.5%4172546712,23595052,946162ap1971
19761,900,0001,950,00097.4%4164164,5673343,831182ap1977
19802,125,0002,250,00094.4%4463407862,7037023,055192ap1981
19902,106,2142,149,19798.0%4272847112,9628044,604234ap1991
19992,512,0652,952,95685.1%5783188962,8038862,674264ap2000
20003,004,3443,106,34496.7%5463328783,421178632,899268ap2001
20012,788,9003,280,99385.0%5973109073,07469512,863270ap2002
20022,667,0122,963,34690.0%5903078972,973239682,966281ap2003
20032,587,2302,907,00089.0%6013109112,839367502,936296ap2004
20042,625,4943,012,84787.1%5903199092,888397602,901301ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Jul 2014