Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Aranguren Echeverria

Bishop of Holguín


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1950 BornSanta Clara
1 Feb 197625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara, Cuba
30 Apr 199140.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara, Cuba
30 Apr 199140.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
23 Jun 199140.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
1 Apr 199544.6AppointedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
14 Nov 200555.2AppointedBishop of Holguín, Cuba
11 Dec 200555.3InstalledBishop of Holguín, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Emilio Aranguren Echeverria:
Bishop Emilio Aranguren Echeverria (born ) Bishop of Holguín

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Holguín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2005
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,546
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013