Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isaac Amani Massawe

Archbishop of Arusha, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1951 Born
29 Jun 197524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Moshi, Tanzania
21 Nov 200756.4AppointedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
22 Feb 200856.6Ordained BishopBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
27 Dec 201766.5AppointedArchbishop of Arusha, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Isaac Amani Massawe
Archbishop Isaac Amani Massawe (born ) Archbishop of Arusha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMango
Ordained BishopOpen air, in front of, Cathedral, Moshi, Diocese of Moshi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Arusha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,678
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast