Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Antiba, B.A.

Patriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1945 Born
23 Mar 196418.2ProfessedMember of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
19 Sep 197125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
29 Aug 198943.6AppointedSuperior General of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
1995²49.0ResignedSuperior General of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
22 Jun 201266.4SelectedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
2 May 201367.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
25 Aug 201367.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
9 Feb 201872.1AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
3 Mar 201872.1InstalledPatriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Antiba
Archbishop Nicolas Antiba B.A. (born ) Patriarchal Vicar of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo
Ordained BishopIn front of, Saint-Sauveur, Church, Sarba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2013
  • c34: CB, 25 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,854
  • ab: CB, 10 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast