Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Maria Giuseppe Agnesi

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Dusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1950 Born
8 Jun 197423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 May 201463.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 May 201463.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dusa
28 Jun 201463.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dusa

MicroData Summary for Franco Maria Giuseppe Agnesi
Bishop Franco Maria Giuseppe Agnesi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 28 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017