Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalberto Martínez Flores

Bishop of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1951 Born
7 Apr 198533.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
24 Aug 198534.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
1993²41.4IncardinatedPriest of Asunción, Paraguay
14 Aug 199746.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
14 Aug 199746.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tatilti
8 Nov 199746.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tatilti
18 May 200048.8AppointedBishop of San Lorenzo, Paraguay
19 Feb 200755.6AppointedBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay
14 Mar 201260.6AppointedBishop of Paraguay, Military
23 Jun 201866.9AppointedBishop of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo, Paraguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adalberto Martínez Flores
Bishop Adalberto Martínez Flores (born ) Bishop of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsuncion

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2007
  • od/c0: CB, 20 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,169
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 Jun 2018

Quantcast