Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Seoul

Archidioecesis Seulensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Chung Soon-taick, O.C.D., Archbishop
  • Job Koo Yobi, Ist. del Prado, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Paul Kyung Sang Lee, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Timothy Yu Gyoung-chon, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Andrew Yeom Soo-jung, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1962
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Korea, Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 17,349 (6,701 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://aos.catholic.or.kr/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 74 Myeongdong-gil, Jung-gu, Seoul 04537, Korea
  • Telephone: (02)727-2024
  • Fax: 773-1947

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Corea
9 September 1831ErectedDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Corea (erected)
8 April 1911Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Corea Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Seul
8 April 1911Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Corea Vicariate Apostolic of Seul
5 August 1920Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Seul Vicariate Apostolic of Wonsan (erected)
17 March 1927Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Seul (North and South Hpyen-an-to) Prefecture Apostolic of Hpyeng-yang (erected)
25 April 1939Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Seul (Kang-uen-to (Kogendo)) Prefecture Apostolic of Shunsen (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Seoul
12 July 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Seul Vicariate Apostolic of Seoul
23 June 1958Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Seoul (Chungcheongnam-do) Vicariate Apostolic of Cheong-ju (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Daijeon (erected)
6 June 1961Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Seoul Vicariate Apostolic of Inch’on (erected)
Archdiocese of Seoul
10 March 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Seoul Archdiocese of Seoul
7 October 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Seoul (Su-Won and Bu-Cheon-Kun, Si-Hung-Kun, Hwa-Seong-Kun, PyeongTaek-Kun, Kwang-Ju- Kun, Yong-In-Kun, An-Seong-Kun, I-Keon-Kun, Yang-Pyeong-Kun, and Yeo-Ju-Kun) Diocese of Suwon (erected)
15 September 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Seoul (Kye Yang Myeon and Ko-Tchon Myeon) Diocese of Incheon {Inch’on}
19 November 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Seoul (Kapyong and Pochon) Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn
24 June 2004Territory LostArchdiocese of Seoul (Northerm Kyounggi with Uijongbu, Koyang, Kuri, Namyang, Paju, Tongduchon-Yangju, and Yeonchon) Diocese of Uijeongbu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Seul
194965,8825,752,0001.1%818181325046ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Seoul
Archdiocese of Seoul
1970156,7225,953,4812.6%1838026359519082458ap1971
1980349,3148,872,1333.9%183992821,238249906103ap1981
1990915,81311,511,0388.0%2871284152,2063691,729138ap1991
19991,253,39212,262,60210.2%5541857391,6964752,319203ap2000
20001,299,90412,358,95810.5%6511768271,5715052,399216ap2001
20011,341,52812,497,13510.7%6072008071,6625242,168227ap2002
20021,370,02112,488,15811.0%6172008171,6765232,520238ap2003
20031,409,02212,519,15311.3%6582158731,6145462,230248ap2004
20041,247,15010,207,29512.2%5912458361,4915762,102197ap2005
20101,406,71010,464,05113.4%6552709251,5205031,774219ap2011
20141,472,81510,143,64514.5%6832259081,6224451,837229ap2015
20171,521,2419,930,61615.3%7562339891,5384321,935229ap2018
20201,528,87610,034,52915.2%8102641,0741,4234451,966232ap2021
20221,534,8879,765,86915.7%8202881,1081,3854741,972232ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Corea
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 131, to Page 132
  • Archdiocese of Seoul
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 552, to Page 555
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 13 Apr 2024