Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Julio César Salcedo Aquino, M.J.

Bishop-Elect of Tlaxcala, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1951 Born
17 Jul 197625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico
2009²57.7AppointedSuperior General of Missionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico
2015²63.7ResignedSuperior General of Missionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico
15 Jun 201766.1AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala, México
30 Aug 201766.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julio César Salcedo Aquino
Father Julio César Salcedo Aquino M.J. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Tlaxcala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopSeminario Conciliar de Nuestra Señora de Ocotlán, Tlaxcala, Diocese of Tlaxcala

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tlaxcala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 21 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Aug 2017