Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope John Paul II

St. Karol Józef Wojtyła

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


from the web site of the diocese

from the web site of the diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1920BornWadowice
20 Oct 194626.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
1 Nov 194626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
4 Jul 195838.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
4 Jul 195838.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ombi
28 Sep 195838.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ombi
13 Jan 196443.7AppointedArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
26 Jun 196747.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196747.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
18 Feb 196847.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
16 Oct 197858.4ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Oct 197858.4InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
2 Apr 200584.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 May 2011Beatified
27 Apr 2014Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Karol Józef Wojtyła: VIAF:35605
Pope St. Karol Józef Wojtyła (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • cano: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014