Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Panikulam

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Uruguay

Titular Archbishop of Caudium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1942 Born
11 Mar 196724.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 199957.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caudium
4 Dec 199957.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
6 Jan 200057.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caudium
3 Jul 200360.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mozambique
24 Oct 200865.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ethiopia
24 Oct 200865.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Somalia
18 Dec 200866.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Djibouti
14 Jun 201471.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
Oct 2017³74.9RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Panikulam
Archbishop George Panikulam (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Uruguay

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuthenchira

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Uruguay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,661
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2014
  • r: CB, 19 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018