Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julio Murat

Apostolic Nuncio to Cameroun

Titular Archbishop of Orange

Apostolic Nuncio to Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1961 Born
25 May 198624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
27 Jan 201250.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zambia
27 Jan 201250.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Orange
3 Mar 201250.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Orange
6 Jun 201250.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malawi
24 Mar 201856.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cameroun
29 Mar 201856.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Julio Murat (VIAF: 38153215)
Archbishop Julio Murat (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Cameroun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarsiyaka, Turkey
Ordained BishopSant'Apollinare, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Cameroun.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2012
  • c34: CB, 3 Mar 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,270
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast