Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph O’Brien

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Phoenix, Arizona, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1935Born
7 May 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tucson, Arizona, USA
9 Nov 198145.9AppointedBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
6 Jan 198246.1Ordained BishopBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
18 Jan 198246.1InstalledBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
18 Jun 200367.5ResignedBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
26 Aug 201882.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Phoenix, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph O’Brien
Bishop Thomas Joseph O’Brien (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Phoenix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIndianapolis, IN

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast