Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Tschang In-Nam

Apostolic Nuncio to Thailand

Titular Archbishop of Amantia

Apostolic Nuncio to Cambodia

Apostolic Delegate to Laos

Apostolic Delegate to Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1949 BornSeoul
17 Dec 197627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}, Korea (South)
19 Oct 200252.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bangladesh
19 Oct 200252.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amantia
6 Jan 200353.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amantia
27 Aug 200757.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uganda
4 Aug 201262.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Thailand
4 Aug 201262.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cambodia
4 Aug 201262.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Myanmar
4 Aug 201262.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos

MicroData Summary for Paul Tschang In-Nam:
Archbishop Paul Tschang In-Nam (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Thailand

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Thailand.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,300
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015