Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Newton Holanda Gurgel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crato, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1923Born
17 Dec 194926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
10 Apr 197955.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
10 Apr 197955.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
27 May 197955.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
24 Nov 199370.0AppointedBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
2 May 200177.5RetiredBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
6 Apr 201793.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Crato, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Newton Holanda Gurgel
Bishop Newton Holanda Gurgel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcopiara
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCrato, Diocese of Crato, Ceara

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 6 Apr 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,928

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast