Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nerses Der Nersessian, C.A.M. †

Deceased

Ordinary Emeritus of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian)

Titular Archbishop of Sebaste degli Armeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1920BornBerlin
8 Sep 194625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista
13 Jul 199170.7AppointedOrdinary of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian), Armenia
9 Jul 199271.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebaste degli Armeni
17 Nov 199272.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sebaste degli Armeni
2 Apr 200584.4RetiredOrdinary of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian), Armenia
24 Dec 200686.1DiedOrdinary Emeritus of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian), Armenia

MicroData Summary for Nerses Der Nersessian:
Archbishop Nerses Der Nersessian C.A.M. (born , died ) Ordinary Emeritus of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale}

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,934
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013