Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rrok Kola Mirdita

Deceased

Archbishop of TiranŽ-DurrŽs, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1939Born
2 Jul 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
25 Dec 199253.2AppointedArchbishop of DurrŽs-TiranŽ, Albania
25 Apr 199353.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of DurrŽs-TiranŽ, Albania
7 Dec 201576.1DiedArchbishop of TiranŽ-DurrŽs, Albania

MicroData Summary for Rrok Kola Mirdita (VIAF: 122049405)
Archbishop Rrok Kola Mirdita (born , died ) Archbishop of TiranŽ-DurrŽs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKlezna, Yugoslavia

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,068
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast