Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paciano Basilio Aniceto

Archbishop Emeritus of San Fernando


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1937 BornSanta Ana
23 Dec 196225.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Fernando, Philippines
7 Apr 197942.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
7 Apr 197942.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
27 May 197942.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
20 Oct 198346.6AppointedBishop of Iba, Philippines
31 Jan 198951.8AppointedArchbishop of San Fernando, Philippines
25 Jul 201477.3RetiredArchbishop of San Fernando, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Paciano Basilio Aniceto:
Archbishop Paciano Basilio Aniceto (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Fernando

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Fernando.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015