Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Maria Cardinal Martini, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1927Born
13 Jul 195225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
29 Dec 197952.8AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
6 Jan 198052.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
10 Feb 198052.9InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
2 Feb 198355.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198355.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
29 Oct 198356.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
11 Jul 200275.4RetiredArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
31 Aug 201285.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Martini (VIAF: 95152191)
Carlo Maria Cardinal Martini S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceGallarate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
  • a cardinal for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 31 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Nov 2017