Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stanisław Cardinal Ryłko

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

Cardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1945 Born
30 Mar 196923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
20 Dec 199550.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Novica
20 Dec 199550.4AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
6 Jan 199650.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novica
4 Oct 200358.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novica
4 Oct 200358.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
2 Apr 200559.7CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
21 Apr 200559.7ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
24 Nov 200762.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re
24 Nov 200762.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 May 200862.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re
28 Feb 201367.6CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
16 Mar 201367.6ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
1 Sep 201671.1CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
28 Dec 201671.4AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Ryłko (VIAF: 162249278)
Stanisław Cardinal Ryłko (born ) Archpriest of Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndrychów, Poland

Please contact the Cardinal through the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,653
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Sep 2017