Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Osvaldo Padilla

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Korea

Titular Archbishop of Pia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1942 Born
20 Feb 196623.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 199048.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pia
17 Dec 199048.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
6 Jan 199148.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pia
199451.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka
22 Aug 199856.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nigeria
31 Jul 200360.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
12 Apr 200865.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Korea
26 Apr 200865.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mongolia
15 Sep 201775.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Korea
15 Sep 201775.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Mongolia

MicroData Summary for Osvaldo Padilla
Archbishop Osvaldo Padilla (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Korea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSogod, Philippines
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Korea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,298
  • r: CB, 15 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 15 Sep 2017