Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Mbilingi, C.S.Sp.

Archbishop of Lubango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1958 BornBândua
26 Feb 198426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Oct 199941.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lwena, Angola
6 Jan 200041.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lwena, Angola
7 Jun 200042.3SucceededBishop of Lwena, Angola
11 Dec 200648.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lubango, Angola
5 Sep 200951.6SucceededArchbishop of Lubango, Angola

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Mbilingi:
Archbishop Gabriel Mbilingi C.S.Sp. (born ) Archbishop of Lubango

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lubango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2006
  • s: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015