Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Galeazzo Sanvitale

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹BornParma
15 Mar 160438.2AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
4 Apr 160438.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
1606²40.0ResignedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
8 Sep 162256.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Galeazzo Sanvitale:
Archbishop Galeazzo Sanvitale (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • ob/c2: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 68, Number 396
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 41, Number 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015