Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Paulino Ríos Reynoso

Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1944 Born
5 Jun 197126.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 199551.1AppointedArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
6 Jan 199651.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
29 Nov 200359.1AppointedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
21 Oct 200662.0ResignedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Paulino Ríos Reynoso
Archbishop José Paulino Ríos Reynoso (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceImperial

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Arequipa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,640

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast