Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Piero Marini

President of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses

Titular Archbishop of Martirano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1942 Born
27 Jun 196523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
30 Sep 198644.7IncardinatedPriest of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
24 Feb 198745.1AppointedMaster of Pontifical Liturgical Celebrations of the Office of Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff
16 Sep 198947.6IncardinatedPriest of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
14 Feb 199856.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Martirano
19 Mar 199856.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martirano
29 Sep 200361.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Martirano
1 Oct 200765.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses

MicroData Summary for Piero Marini (VIAF: 15597272)
Archbishop Piero Marini (born ) President of International Eucharistic Congresses

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValverde, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
Ordained PriestSanto Stefano Protomartire, Church, Valverde, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,253
  • inca/loc: AM, 11 Feb 2019
  • c1: AM, 12 Mar 2021
  • c1.loc: AM, 19 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast