Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominik Hrušovskę

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Belarus

Titular Archbishop of Tubia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1926Born
23 Dec 195024.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 198256.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubia
6 Jan 198356.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubia
17 Dec 199266.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia
15 Apr 199669.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tubia
15 Apr 199669.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belarus
28 Jul 200175.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Belarus
27 Jul 201690.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Belarus

MicroData Summary for Dominik Hrušovskę
Archbishop Dominik Hrušovskę (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Belarus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelká Mana, Slovakia
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Oct 2020

Quantcast