Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Błażej Kruszyłowicz, O.F.M. Conv.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień

Titular Bishop of Hadrumetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1936 BornGlinciškes
7 Feb 196023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
9 Dec 198953.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
9 Dec 198953.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
6 Jan 199053.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
11 May 201377.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Błażej Kruszyłowicz:
Bishop Marian Błażej Kruszyłowicz O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Szczecin-Kamień.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,683
  • r: Bollettino, 11 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013