Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pellegrino Tomaso Ronchi, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Cittą di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1930 BornRiolo Terme
21 Mar 195323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
7 Dec 198454.8AppointedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
6 Jan 198554.9Ordained BishopBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
9 Nov 198555.8ResignedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
7 Feb 199161.0AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
9 Mar 199161.1InstalledBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
16 Jun 200777.4RetiredBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pellegrino Tomaso Ronchi:
Bishop Pellegrino Tomaso Ronchi O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cittą di Castello

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cittą di Castello.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015