Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tarcisius Ngalalekumtwa

Bishop of Iringa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1948 BornBanawanu
17 Apr 197324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Iringa, Tanzania
14 Nov 198840.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania
6 Jan 198940.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania
21 Nov 199244.1AppointedBishop of Iringa, Tanzania
15 May 201364.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Songea, Tanzania
18 May 201465.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Songea, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Tarcisius Ngalalekumtwa:
Bishop Tarcisius Ngalalekumtwa (born ) Bishop of Iringa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iringa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,027
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 May 2014