Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Harvey Clark

Bishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1937 Born
19 Dec 196225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Albany, New York, USA
23 Apr 197941.7AppointedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
27 May 197941.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
26 Jun 197941.9InstalledBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
21 Sep 201275.1RetiredBishop of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Matthew Harvey Clark
Bishop Matthew Harvey Clark (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rochester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rochester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017