Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcel Utembi Tapa

Archbishop of Kisangani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1959 BornLuma
29 Jun 198425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
16 Oct 200142.8AppointedBishop of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Jan 200243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Nov 200849.9AppointedArchbishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Jan 200950.0InstalledArchbishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Marcel Utembi Tapa:
Archbishop Marcel Utembi Tapa (born ) Archbishop of Kisangani

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kisangani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013