Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto Berloco

Apostolic Nuncio to Belgium

Titular Archbishop of Fidenae

Apostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1941 BornAltamura, Italy
19 Mar 196624.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 199048.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Fidenae
15 Mar 199048.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Zimbabwe
15 Mar 199048.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mozambique
5 Apr 199048.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Fidenae
17 Jul 199351.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
5 May 199856.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
5 May 199856.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belize, Antilles
24 Feb 200563.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
18 Jun 200967.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
24 Jul 200967.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Berloco:
Archbishop Giacinto Berloco (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Belgium

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Belgium.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2009
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,784
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Jul 2014