Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Bam’ba Gongoa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bondo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1926BornBenge
21 Apr 195327.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 198054.0AppointedBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 May 198054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Nov 199266.8ResignedBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 Sep 199872.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Marcel Bam’ba Gongoa:
Bishop Marcel Bam’ba Gongoa (born 1926, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bondo

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015